MN HF182 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Robbins
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congressionally chartered veterans organizations property exemption provided.
Title
Congressionally chartered veterans organizations property exemption provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Robbins |
2021-03-11 | House | Authors added Boe and Poston |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF259 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Author added Jasinski