MN HF1813 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Her
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Her
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis-St. Paul International Airport public infrastructure refundable construction exemption provided.
Title
Minneapolis-St. Paul International Airport public infrastructure refundable construction exemption provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Her |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2237 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Taxes