MN HF181 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Duluth; Public Facilities Authority funding provided for the purpose of debt relief for the Duluth North Shore Sanitary District, and money appropriated.
Title
Duluth; Public Facilities Authority funding provided for the purpose of debt relief for the Duluth North Shore Sanitary District, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred by Chair to Greater Minnesota Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF478 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance