MN HF1808 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Lee, Lillie, and Franke
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Authors added Lee, Lillie, and Franke
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School counselor provisions modified and mental illness training required, and money appropriated.
Title
School counselor provisions modified and mental illness training required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Authors added Lee, Lillie, and Franke |
2022-03-24 | House | Authors added Gomez and Noor |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Long |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Feist |
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2022-03-03 | House | Authors added Frazier, Hassan |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Howard |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1966 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Marty