MN HF1805 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Sanstede
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency services grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency services grant funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Sanstede
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Mann, Lee, and Hornstein
2019-03-14HouseAuthors added Vang, Lillie, Huot, Schultz, and Xiong, J.
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Olson
2019-02-28HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-28HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback