MN HF1802 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Koegel
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Author added Koegel
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Brewer off-sale license condition modified.
Title
Brewer off-sale license condition modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Koegel |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1737 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy