MN HF1801 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Lee, K.
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A house resolution urging Congress to pass federal legislation granting statehood to the people of Washington, D.C.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A house resolution urging Congress to pass federal legislation granting statehood to the people of Washington, D.C.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-20HouseAuthor added Lee, K.
2024-03-18HouseAuthor added Fischer
2024-02-26HouseAuthor added Long
2023-03-30HouseAuthors added Hollins and Bahner
2023-03-28HouseAuthor added Reyer
2023-03-27HouseAuthors added Pinto, Liebling, Newton, and Rehm
2023-03-01HouseAuthor added Smith
2023-02-28HouseAuthors added Hicks; Pryor
2023-02-20HouseAuthor added Pursell
2023-02-15HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1774 (Similar To) 2023-02-16 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback