MN HF180 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Author added Persell
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Centers for independent living funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Centers for independent living funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Persell
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Hamilton, Liebling, and Bennett
2019-01-17HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF281 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback