MN HF1799 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Past military service credit modified.
Title
Past military service credit modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Rosenthal [D] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Nolan West [R] |
Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2017-03-23 | House | Author added West. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1541 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Author added Isaacson