MN HF1782 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Author added Heinrich
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter program established to provide payments to those with cancer or heart disease, and for firefighter counseling and training; and money appropriated.
Title
Firefighter program established to provide payments to those with cancer or heart disease, and for firefighter counseling and training; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2020-03-04 | House | Author added Schultz |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Claflin |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Winkler |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Mann |
2020-02-18 | House | Author added Urdahl |
2020-02-13 | House | Authors added Howard, Klevorn, and Poston |
2020-02-11 | House | Authors added Bahner, Stephenson, Bennett, Becker-Finn, and Sundin |
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Edelson |
2019-04-10 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2019-04-01 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-21 | House | Author added Olson |
2019-03-20 | House | Authors added Pryor and Nornes |
2019-03-14 | House | Authors added Lueck, Marquart, and Theis |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2264 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Chief author added Howe