MN HF1777 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 150 03/21/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus tax bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus tax bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 126 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail To suspend rules and declare urgency (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail To suspend rules and declare urgency (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 59 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 58 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26 Secretary of State Chapter 150 03/21/14
2014-03-21 Governor's action Approval
2014-03-21 Presented to Governor
2014-03-21 Secretary of State, Filed
2014-03-21HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 126-2
2014-03-21HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2014-03-21HouseMotion prevailed
2014-03-21HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2014-03-21HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2014-03-21SenateThird reading Passed vote: 58-5
2014-03-21SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2014-03-20SenateMotion did not prevail To suspend rules and declare urgency vote: 38-28
2014-03-20SenateSecond reading
2014-03-20SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2014-03-10SenateReferred to Taxes
2014-03-10SenateMotion did not prevail To suspend rules and declare urgency vote: 26-38
2014-03-10SenateIntroduction and first reading
2014-03-10SenateReceived from House
2014-03-06HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 126-2
2014-03-06HouseThird reading as amended
2014-03-06HouseAmended
2014-03-06HouseAmendments offered
2014-03-06HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
2014-03-04HouseAuthors added Falk, Halverson, and Bernardy
2014-03-04HouseSecond reading
2014-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended question recurred
2014-03-04HouseMotion prevailed vote: 71-58
2014-03-04HouseMotion to lay on the table
2014-03-04HouseMinority report offered
2014-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2014-03-03HouseAuthor added Davids
2014-03-03HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2013-04-16HouseAuthor added Beard
2013-04-15HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF75 (Similar To) 2014-03-20 - HF substituted in committee HF1777

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1777&ssn=0&y=2013
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=0&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=1&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=2&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=3&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=4&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=0&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=1&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=2&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=3&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1777&version=4&session=ls88&session_year=2013&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF1777&session_number=0&year=2013&id=684
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF1777&session_number=0&year=2013&id=685
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF1777&session_number=0&year=2013&id=686
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF1777&session_number=0&year=2013&id=687
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=88&billnum=HF1777&session_number=0&year=2013&id=707
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls88&number=6012
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls88&number=6494
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls88&number=6520

Bill Comments

feedback