MN HF1773 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Medal of Honor Commemorative Memorial construction appropriation transferred.
Title
Minnesota Medal of Honor Commemorative Memorial construction appropriation transferred.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] |
Rep. John Petersburg [R] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-03-19 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1923 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Author added Wiger