MN HF1773 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Minnesota Medal of Honor Commemorative Memorial construction funding provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minnesota Medal of Honor Commemorative Memorial construction funding provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReferred by Chair to State Government Finance Division
2019-03-19HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-02-27HouseReferred by Chair to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1923 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Author added Wiger

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback