MN HF1773 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Court appeal notice date clarified, alternative proof of timely mailing allowed, and small claims jurisdiction increased.
Title
Tax Court appeal notice date clarified, alternative proof of timely mailing allowed, and small claims jurisdiction increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2017-02-27 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |