MN HF1756 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dakota County; railway and highway safety improvement for pedestrian and bicycle trail funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Dakota County; railway and highway safety improvement for pedestrian and bicycle trail funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Liz Reyer [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-03-18 | House | Authors added Reyer and Huot |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Koznick |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF1590 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Capital Investment