MN HF1741 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Author added Bahner
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Living organ donors; status discrimination prohibited, paid leave benefits extended, unpaid leave required, and a conforming change made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Living organ donors; status discrimination prohibited, paid leave benefits extended, unpaid leave required, and a conforming change made.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseAuthor added Bahner
2019-03-18HouseAuthors added Pryor and Mann
2019-03-14HouseAuthors added Fischer and Becker-Finn
2019-02-27HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1146 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Authors added Dibble; Clausen

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback