MN HF1738 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Petersburg
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Petersburg
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled or injured police officer benefit adequacy study created.
Title
Disabled or injured police officer benefit adequacy study created.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] |
Rep. John Petersburg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Petersburg |
2020-03-05 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2022 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections