MN HF1735 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Lueck.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Lueck.
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School trust land administration transferred, school trust management account established, and rulemaking authorized.
Title
School trust land administration transferred, school trust management account established, and rulemaking authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Swedzinski. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2189 (Similar To) 2017-04-27 - Author added Newton