MN HF1733 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties required to collect soil and water conservation district fees on deed transfer and mortgage registration.
Title
Counties required to collect soil and water conservation district fees on deed transfer and mortgage registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2195 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance