MN HF1722 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Pinto
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Pinto
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Comunidades Latinas Unidas En Servicio-Latino Communities United in Service (CLUES) funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Comunidades Latinas Unidas En Servicio-Latino Communities United in Service (CLUES) funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] |
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Pinto |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1758 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance