MN HF1711 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prekindergarten through grade 12 technical and policy changes made including general education, education excellence, teachers, special education, health and safety, facilities, nutrition, and state agencies; and reports required.
Title
Prekindergarten through grade 12 technical and policy changes made including general education, education excellence, teachers, special education, health and safety, facilities, nutrition, and state agencies; and reports required.
Sponsors
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] | Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Wazlawik |
2019-03-11 | House | Authors added Moller, Davnie, Bierman, Christensen, Huot, and Kunesh-Podein |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1958 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Second reading