MN HF1703 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care assistance to low-income workers increased to enable higher-equality early childhood care and education provided, child care assistance reimbursement rates increased, and basic sliding fee child care assistance program forecasted.
Title
Child care assistance to low-income workers increased to enable higher-equality early childhood care and education provided, child care assistance reimbursement rates increased, and basic sliding fee child care assistance program forecasted.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] |
Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Vang |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF625 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy