MN HF1691 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Hornstein
Pending: House State and Local Government Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public employee labor relations modified, and collective bargaining modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employee labor relations modified, and collective bargaining modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2023-03-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy
2023-03-09HouseAuthor added Acomb
2023-03-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2023-02-13HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1632 (Similar To) 2023-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback