MN HF1686 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Munson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disclosure of health care records consent statutory form established.
Title
Disclosure of health care records consent statutory form established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Munson |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1744 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Author added Clausen