MN HF1684 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Howe; Osmek; Bigham
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Howe; Osmek; Bigham
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus transportation finance bill.
Title
Omnibus transportation finance bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1684 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Koznick Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Koznick Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Koznick Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: H.F. NO. 1684 (Y: 69 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Koznick Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Koznick Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment to Koznick Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 68 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 64 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-17 - House - House: 67 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 63 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Howe; Osmek; Bigham |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | House conferees Hornstein; Koegel; Frederick; Elkins; Petersburg |
2021-04-27 | Senate | House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate conferees Newman; Jasinski; Howe; Osmek; Bigham |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed |
2021-04-26 | House | House conferees Hornstein, Koegel, Frederick, Elkins, Petersburg |
2021-04-26 | House | House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned from Senate with amendment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1159 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1159 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-04-17 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2021-04-17 | House | Third reading as amended |
2021-04-17 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2021-04-17 | House | Amended |
2021-04-17 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-04-17 | House | Motion to take from table |
2021-04-16 | House | Motion prevailed |
2021-04-16 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported to the House |
2021-04-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, April 16, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1159 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1684