MN HF1682 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Author added Dotseth
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Author added Dotseth
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota schools authorized to serve two percent and whole milk to kindergarten students as part of state-sponsored school milk program, commissioners of education and agriculture required to report to legislature on additional milk options for participants in national school meals programs, funding increased for kindergarten milk program, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota schools authorized to serve two percent and whole milk to kindergarten students as part of state-sponsored school milk program, commissioners of education and agriculture required to report to legislature on additional milk options for participants in national school meals programs, funding increased for kindergarten milk program, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Isaac Schultz [R] |
Rep. Krista Knudsen [R] | Rep. Jeff Dotseth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Dotseth |
2023-02-20 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Schultz |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2643 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Referred to Education Policy