MN HF168 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cumulative pollution analysis requirement before air quality permit issuance modified.
Title
Cumulative pollution analysis requirement before air quality permit issuance modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Author added Moller |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Hollins and Her |
2021-02-18 | House | Authors added Becker-Finn, Keeler, Jordan, and Wazlawik |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Lippert |
2021-01-25 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF186 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Author added Pappas