MN HF168 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added Urdahl.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added Urdahl.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organ harvesting; a resolution expressing concern over reports of forced organ harvesting from prisoners for their spiritual beliefs and other minority groups in the People's Republic of China.
Title
Organ harvesting; a resolution expressing concern over reports of forced organ harvesting from prisoners for their spiritual beliefs and other minority groups in the People's Republic of China.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Author added Urdahl. |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added O'Neill. |
2017-03-08 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-03-01 | House | Authors added Johnson, S., and Lucero. |
2017-02-23 | House | Author added Applebaum. |
2017-02-22 | House | Author added Allen. |
2017-01-23 | House | Authors added Halverson and Moran. |
2017-01-17 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2017-01-12 | House | Author added Ward. |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF122 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Author added Sparks