MN HF1676 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voluntary prekindergarten program funded participant number for fiscal year 2020 and later increased, and money appropriated.
Title
Voluntary prekindergarten program funded participant number for fiscal year 2020 and later increased, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Steve Sandell [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Mann |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Education Finance Division |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1057 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy