MN HF1674 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan Council and Calhoun Isles Condominium Association facilitated conversation required, Metropolitan Council vibration susceptibility study required, and Metropolitan Council cost reimbursement to Calhoun Isles Condominium Association required.
Title
Metropolitan Council and Calhoun Isles Condominium Association facilitated conversation required, Metropolitan Council vibration susceptibility study required, and Metropolitan Council cost reimbursement to Calhoun Isles Condominium Association required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Dehn |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Runbeck |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1654 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy