MN HF167 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Supplemental environmental project offers provided in conjunction with enforcement actions against polluters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental environmental project offers provided in conjunction with enforcement actions against polluters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseReferred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2019-03-20HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-03-14HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Fischer
2019-01-31HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Dehn, Hornstein, Freiberg, Moran, and Her
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF879 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Author added Wiger

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback