MN HF1666 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care authorizations for parenting time clarified, child care reimbursement for parenting time clarified, child care report requirements clarified, parenting time presumptions modified, and parenting time schedule findings required.
Title
Child care authorizations for parenting time clarified, child care reimbursement for parenting time clarified, child care report requirements clarified, parenting time presumptions modified, and parenting time schedule findings required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-03-20 | House | Author stricken Wolgamott |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Sundin |
2019-03-13 | House | Author stricken Hassan |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Lislegard |
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Miller, Koznick, Lucero, Layman, and Hassan |
2019-03-04 | House | Authors added Munson, Considine, O'Neill, Ecklund, Drazkowski, Wolgamott, and Runbeck |
2019-03-04 | House | Author stricken Edelson |
2019-02-28 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-02-28 | House | Authors added Elkins, Haley, and Edelson |
2019-02-27 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Franson, Nornes, and Heinrich |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1295 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Author added Hall