MN HF1659 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Acomb
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sexually exploited youth and youth at risk shelter, services, and other activities funding provided; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually exploited youth and youth at risk shelter, services, and other activities funding provided; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Acomb
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-11HouseAuthor added Moran
2019-03-07HouseAuthors added Bierman and Dehn
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Moller
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Mann
2019-02-25HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1868 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback