MN HF1653 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human services commissioner permitted to collect data about children's mental health screenings, public guardianship requirements clarified for a person with a developmental disability, requirements modified for a petition for an appointment of public guardianship for a person with a developmental disability, terminology and related changes made, and technical changes made.
Title
Human services commissioner permitted to collect data about children's mental health screenings, public guardianship requirements clarified for a person with a developmental disability, requirements modified for a petition for an appointment of public guardianship for a person with a developmental disability, terminology and related changes made, and technical changes made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-03-04 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1671 (Similar To) 2021-03-17 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy