MN HF165 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Author changed Baker (Chief)
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Author changed Baker (Chief)
Pending: House Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy storage system pilot project utility cost recovery criteria established, investor-owned utilities required to include in integrated resource plans an assessment of energy storage systems, cost-benefit analysis of energy storage systems required, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Energy storage system pilot project utility cost recovery criteria established, investor-owned utilities required to include in integrated resource plans an assessment of energy storage systems, cost-benefit analysis of energy storage systems required, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Author changed Baker (Chief) |
2019-01-28 | House | Author added Boe |
2019-01-24 | House | Author added Albright |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF100 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - See First Special Session 2019, HF2, Art. 11, Sec. 2, 4-5, 14