MN HF1648 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal defenses and authorization limited for the use of force relating to a victim's sexual orientation or identity.
Title
Criminal defenses and authorization limited for the use of force relating to a victim's sexual orientation or identity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Long |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1512 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Marty