MN HF163 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parenting with a disability support services pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Parenting with a disability support services pilot project established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Her |
2021-02-11 | House | Authors added Albright, Moller, Novotny, and Robbins |
2021-01-21 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF296 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections