MN HF1618 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Author added Poston.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Author added Poston.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband grant money transferred.
Title
Broadband grant money transferred.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Author added Poston. |
2017-03-20 | House | Author added Layman. |
2017-03-14 | House | Author added Howe. |
2017-03-07 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Thissen. |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |