MN HF1605 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Authors added Lippert and Cantrell
Pending: House Subcommittee on Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative and congressional district boundaries commission appointment required, legislative and congressional plan districting principles established, Legislative Coordinating Commission duties assigned, and secretary of state duties assigned.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative and congressional district boundaries commission appointment required, legislative and congressional plan districting principles established, Legislative Coordinating Commission duties assigned, and secretary of state duties assigned.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthors added Lippert and Cantrell
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Edelson
2019-03-11HouseAuthors added Christensen, Long, Freiberg, and Bierman
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Richardson
2019-02-28HouseAuthors added Huot, Sandell, and Schultz
2019-02-26HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF2575 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Author added Abeler

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback