MN HF1605 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement and family members enabled to petition a court to prohibit people from possessing firearms if they pose a significant danger to themselves or others.
Title
Law enforcement and family members enabled to petition a court to prohibit people from possessing firearms if they pose a significant danger to themselves or others.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2018-02-22 | House | House rule 4.31, notice of request to return bill to the house |
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Moran. |
2017-02-27 | House | Author added Clark. |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1262 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Author added Clausen