MN HF1599 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-20 - Author added Knudsen
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Online personal finance class required for high school graduation.
Title
Online personal finance class required for high school graduation.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Pfarr [R] | Rep. Mark Wiens [R] | Rep. Bobbie Harder [R] | Rep. Elliott Engen [R] |
Rep. Brian Daniels [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Isaac Schultz [R] | Rep. Bernie Perryman [R] |
Rep. Krista Knudsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Author added Knudsen |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Perryman |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF242 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Author added Duckworth