MN HF1593 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Neu Brindley
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Neu Brindley
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Peace officer authorized use of deadly force effective date modified.
Title
Peace officer authorized use of deadly force effective date modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Neu Brindley |
2021-03-08 | House | Authors added Rasmusson and Bennett |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1588 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Author added Goggin