MN HF1589 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Author added Greenman
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Catalytic converter sale to scrap metal dealers regulated, and criminal penalties provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Catalytic converter sale to scrap metal dealers regulated, and criminal penalties provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseAuthor added Greenman
2021-03-17HouseAuthor added Huot
2021-03-04HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce Finance and Policy
2021-03-04HouseAuthors added Jurgens and Bierman
2021-03-01HouseAuthors added Moller and Long
2021-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF890 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Author added Kunesh

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback