MN HF1581 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 25
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative enactments; miscellaneous and technical corrections made to laws and statutes; erroneous, obsolete, and omitted text and references corrected; and redundant, conflicting, and superseded provisions removed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative enactments; miscellaneous and technical corrections made to laws and statutes; erroneous, obsolete, and omitted text and references corrected; and redundant, conflicting, and superseded provisions removed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Secretary of State Chapter 25
2023-04-18 Governor's action Approval
2023-04-18 Secretary of State, Filed
2023-04-18 Governor approval
2023-04-17 Presented to Governor
2023-04-12HouseReturned from Senate
2023-04-12SenateThird reading Passed
2023-04-12SenateSpecial Order
2023-04-11SenateSecond reading
2023-04-11SenateComm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1497
2023-04-04SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1497, now on General Orders
2023-04-04SenateIntroduction and first reading
2023-04-04SenateReceived from House
2023-04-03HouseBill was passed
2023-04-03HouseThird reading
2023-03-30HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 3, 2023
2023-03-09HouseSecond reading
2023-03-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2023-02-09HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Same As/Similar To

SF1497 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF1581, SF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback