MN HF1580 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Durable medical equipment and medical supplies supplemental payments provided to providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Durable medical equipment and medical supplies supplemental payments provided to providers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-11HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Lesch
2019-02-21HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1248 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback