MN HF1578 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Credit union conversion, merger, or consolidation supermajority requirements eliminated.
Title
Credit union conversion, merger, or consolidation supermajority requirements eliminated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-01 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1703 |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1703 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Secretary of State Chapter 20 05/09/2019