MN HF1562 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Natural resources submission deadline modified, state park permit provisions modified, shooting at decoys from motor vehicles prohibited, insecticides prohibited on state lands, blaze requirements modified for clothing and ground blinds, small game shot restrictions imposed, motorized decoy restrictions modified, turtle taking provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Natural resources submission deadline modified, state park permit provisions modified, shooting at decoys from motor vehicles prohibited, insecticides prohibited on state lands, blaze requirements modified for clothing and ground blinds, small game shot restrictions imposed, motorized decoy restrictions modified, turtle taking provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1533 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance