MN HF1556 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 40 05/14/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 40 05/14/15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hire a Veteran Month changed from May to July.
Title
Hire a Veteran Month changed from May to July.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House: Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 40 05/14/15 | |
2015-05-14 | Governor's action Approval | |
2015-05-14 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2015-05-14 | Governor approval | |
2015-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2015-05-14 | House | Returned from Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 59-0 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Special Order |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1446 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1446, now on General Orders |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-05-05 | House | Bill was passed vote: 129-0 |
2015-05-05 | House | Third reading |
2015-05-04 | House | Author added Atkins. |
2015-05-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 5, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2015-03-10 | House | Author added Howe. |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Veterans Affairs Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF1446 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - HF substituted on General Orders HF1556