MN HF1542 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Shelter-linked youth mental health grant program established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Shelter-linked youth mental health grant program established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Pinto |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Carlson, L. |
2019-02-25 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1730 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Author added Dziedzic