MN HF1517 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Hamilton
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Hamilton
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education state grant parameters adjusted, and money appropriated.
Title
Higher education state grant parameters adjusted, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2021-03-18 | House | Author added Lee |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Christensen |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Thompson and Noor |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1975 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Authors added Clausen; Goggin